Stewart v Hartford et al.
Plaintiff: Walter Mitchell Stewart, Jr.
Defendant: Brielle Goffena, Brandon Hartford and Parker, Heitz, Cosgrove Attonreys at Law
Case Number: 1:2020cv00103
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX9-15326 (TAG)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION by Walter Mitchell Stewart, Jr. (TAG)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Walter Mitchell Stewart, Jr. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (TAG)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Walter Mitchell Stewart, Jr. (TAG)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. Amended Pleading due by 8/14/2020. Fee/IFP due by 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/20/2020. Mailed to Stewart with forms (TAG)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Walter Mitchell Stewart, Jr. (Attachment(s) : #1 Exhibit) (TAG). (TAG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v Hartford et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Mitchell Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brielle Goffena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker, Heitz, Cosgrove Attonreys at Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?