Brodock v. Nevro Corp.
Plaintiff: Kevin Brodock
Defendant: Nevro Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00110
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts I and III-V MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Count VI filed by Nevro Corp.. (Kappelman, Ben)
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts I and III-V MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Count VI filed by Kevin Brodock. (Procter, Veronica)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/14/2020. (EMH)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/12/2020. (HEG)
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kevin Brodock. (Procter, Veronica)
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Nevro Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Al Taqatqa, Briana)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Nevro Corp.. (Al Taqatqa, Briana)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Protective Order Briana S. Al Taqatqa appearing for Defendant Nevro Corp. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Al Taqatqa, Briana)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Nevro Corp. re #13 Brief/Memorandum in Support Notice of Explanation (Kappelman, Ben)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts I and III-V MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Count VI (Corrected) filed by Nevro Corp.. (Kappelman, Ben)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts I and III-V MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Count VI filed by Nevro Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brodock 2016 Offer Letter Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Brodock Proprietary Information and Inventions Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Brodock 2018 Amendment to the Offer Letter Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Brodock Proposed Separation Agreement, #5 Exhibit January 17, 2020 Email from Nevro HR to Brodock, #6 Exhibit F - January 23, 2020 Email from Brodock to Nevro Executives, #7 Exhibit G - January 31, 2020 Email from Determann to Brodock) (Kappelman, Ben)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts I and III-V MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Count VI filed by Nevro Corp.. (Kappelman, Ben)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts I and III-V, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Count VI Ben D. Kappelman appearing for Defendant Nevro Corp. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Kappelman, Ben)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana S. Al Taqatqa on behalf of Nevro Corp. (Al Taqatqa, Briana)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED: Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by July 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/27/2020. (HEG)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Mailing of Consent to a Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Sent to counsel Veronica A. Procter and Ben D. Kappelman. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/13/2020. (JDR)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed in State Court against Nevro Corp., filed by Kevin Brodock. (JDR)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT FILE: DV-56-2020-0000858-BC, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDR)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Respond to Complaint Ben D. Kappelman appearing for Defendant Nevro Corp. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kappelman, Ben)
July 23, 2020 Remark: UPDATE our CM/ECF system had two Veronica Procter's. Last name spelled differently. Clerk updated the docket to reflect that Veronica Procter is a CM/ECF filer and is registered. (AMC)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 CM/ECF REGISTRATION LETTER TO ATTORNEY VERONICA PROCTER from Clerk of Court. Clerk mailed a copy to attorney. (AMC)
July 22, 2020 Filing fee -PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2515217 (AMC)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nevro Corp. (AMC)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( CASE NUMBER CV-20-110-BLG-SPW-TJC) by Nevro Corp. from Yellowstone County State Court, case number DV-20-0858 filed by Nevro Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Frazier, #2 State Court Complaint and Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brodock v. Nevro Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevro Corp.
Represented By: Ben D. Kappelman
Represented By: Briana S. Al Taqatqa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Brodock
Represented By: Ben D. Kappelman
Represented By: Veronica A. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?