Red Lodge Ales Brewing Company v. Axiom LLC
Plaintiff: Red Lodge Ales Brewing Company
Defendant: Axiom LLC d/b/a Lockhorn Hard Cider
Case Number: 1:2020cv00119
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Red Lodge Ales Brewing Company. All Defendants. (Tease, Antoinette)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Affidavit of Non-Service by Red Lodge Ales Brewing Company. (Tease, Antoinette)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of non-service by Red Lodge Ales Brewing Company. (Tease, Antoinette)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/29/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/29/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/5/2020. (TXB)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Red Lodge Ales Brewing Company. (Tease, Antoinette)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 Patent and Trademark form transmitted to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.. (Tease, Antoinette)
August 4, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2521547 (EMH)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Axiom LLC d/b/a Lockhorn Hard Cider. (EMH)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Axiom LLC d/b/a Lockhorn Hard Cider, filed by Red Lodge Ales Brewing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Lodge Ales Brewing Company v. Axiom LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Lodge Ales Brewing Company
Represented By: Antoinette M. Tease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axiom LLC d/b/a Lockhorn Hard Cider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?