v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: David Jon Brown
Defendant: Signal Peak Energy, LLC and John Does I-II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00180
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Signal Peak Energy, LLC answer due 2/12/2021. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/21/2021. (AMC)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Signal Peak Energy, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Global Mining Group, LLC for Signal Peak Energy, LLC.. (Lopach, Paul)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Paul J. Lopach appearing for Defendant Signal Peak Energy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) (Lopach, Paul)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/31/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/24/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/31/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2021 at 09:00 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/12/2021. (AMC)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Jon Brown. Signal Peak Energy, LLC served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Schwaller, Jacob)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Signal Peak Energy, LLC. (E-Filed summons can be downloaded from CM ECF by attorney for service on the party listed) (EMH)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL LLC against Signal Peak Energy and John Does I-II,, filed by David Jon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)
December 14, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2587839. (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal Peak Energy, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Lopach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jon Brown
Represented By: Jacob R. Schwaller
Represented By: Shane Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?