Northern Cheyenne Tribe v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Northern Cheyenne Tribe
Defendant: David Bernhardt, The United States of America, Darryl LaCounte, Susan Messerly, Lenora Nioce, Bureau of Indian Affairs and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2020cv00183
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/19/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/12/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/19/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/28/2021. (AMC)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lenora Nioce on December 16, 2020, filed by Northern Cheyenne Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit Return Receipt, #3 Exhibit Return Receipt) (Chestnut, Brian)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Northern Cheyenne Tribe upon the United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit Return Receipt) (Chestnut, Brian)
December 16, 2020 Remark: Pro Hac Vice attorney Brian Chestnut is now a registered e-filer (AMC)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 8 to Complaint) (Baldwin, Beth)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER notifying Pro Hac Vice attorney Brian Chestnut to register (AMC)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE STATUS FOR BETH BALDWIN #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Beth Baldwin for Northern Cheyenne Tribe. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/16/2020. (AMC)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE STATUS FOR BRIAN CHESTNUT #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/16/2020. (AMC)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Beth Baldwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2588847.) Joe A. Rodriguez appearing for Plaintiff Northern Cheyenne Tribe (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Beth Baldwin, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Rodriguez, Joe)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION Brian Chestnut to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2588843.) Joe A. Rodriguez appearing for Plaintiff Northern Cheyenne Tribe (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Chestnut, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Rodriguez, Joe)
December 15, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2588536 (EMH)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # Summons- USA attached as main document (1) Summons DOI, #2 Summons BIA, #3 Summons Bernhard, #4 Summons LeCounte, #5 Summons Messerley, #6 Summons Nioce) (E-FILED SUMMONS CAN BE DOWNLOADED FROM CM- ECF BY ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE) (EMH)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, Bureau of Indian Affairs, Darryl LaCounte, Susan Messerly, Lenora Nioce, The United States of America, United States Department of the Interior, filed by Northern Cheyenne Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2020: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (EMH). (Main Document 1 replaced incomplete initial filing on 12/16/2020) (JDH). Modified on 12/16/2020(JDH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Cheyenne Tribe v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl LaCounte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Messerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenora Nioce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Cheyenne Tribe
Represented By: Joe A. Rodriguez
Represented By: Beth Baldwin
Represented By: Brian William Chestnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?