Palmer v. Montana Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Steven Palmer doing business as Montana Organic Medical Supply
Defendant: Darci Wiebe, Jamin Grantham, John Does 1-10, Steve Hallam, City of Billings, Montana Department of Health and Human Services and State of Montana
Case Number: 1:2021cv00038
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steven Palmer. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff shall file a respond to the Partial Motion to Dismiss by June 11, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/3/2021. (HEG)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Robert Farris-Olsen appearing for Plaintiff Steven Palmer Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy J. Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Benjamin Joseph Alke, Harlan B. Krogh, Michael Alan Kauffman, Robert Farris-Olsen, Scott L. Peterson. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/7/2021. (ACC)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan B. Krogh on behalf of City of Billings, Steve Hallam (Krogh, Harlan)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Billings, Steve Hallam. (Alke, Benjamin)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Benjamin Joseph Alke appearing for Defendants City of Billings, Steve Hallam Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Alke, Benjamin)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/14/2021. (JDH)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #12 Brief/Memorandum in Support Robert Farris-Olsen appearing for Plaintiff Steven Palmer Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jamin Grantham, Montana Department of Health and Human Services, State of Montana, Darci Wiebe. (Kauffman, Michael)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Defendants Jamin Grantham, Montana Department of Health and Human Services, State of Montana, Darci Wiebe Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Kauffman, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint & Summons served on State of Montana with copy to Dept of Admin on 4/12/2021, filed by Steven Palmer. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint & Summons served on Jamin Grantham on 4/13/2021, filed by Steven Palmer. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint & Summons served on DPHHS by Attorney Nicholas Domitrovich on 4/12/2021, filed by Steven Palmer. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint & Summons served on Darci Wiebe on 4/12/2021, filed by Steven Palmer. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint & Summons served on City of Billings by Val Ronquillo on 4/13/2021, filed by Steven Palmer. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint & Summons served on Steve Hallam on 4/13/2021, filed by Steven Palmer. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to State of Montana. Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiff's Counsel for service (AMC)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants, filed by Steven Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Summons - State of Montana) (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Billings, Jamin Grantham, Steve Hallam, Montana Department of Health and Human Services, Darci Wiebe. (Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiff's Counsel for service.) (JDH)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City of Billings, Jamin Grantham, Steve Hallam, John Does 1-10, Montana Department of Health and Human Services, Darci Wiebe, filed by Steven Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2645259 (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Montana Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Palmer doing business as Montana Organic Medical Supply
Represented By: Scott L. Peterson
Represented By: Robert Farris-Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darci Wiebe
Represented By: Michael Alan Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamin Grantham
Represented By: Michael Alan Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hallam
Represented By: Harlan B. Krogh
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Alke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Billings
Represented By: Harlan B. Krogh
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Alke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Michael Alan Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Represented By: Michael Alan Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?