Reed v. Saul et al
Plaintiff: Mikelann Reed
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00040
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint, including the certified administrative record by August 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/4/2021. (HEG)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner Edmund John Darcher appearing for Defendant Andrew Saul Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Darcher, Edmund)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy J. Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel James P. O'Brien, Edmund John Darcher, Victoria L. Francis. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/21/2021. (ACC)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund John Darcher on behalf of Andrew Saul (Darcher, Edmund)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Saul. (JDH)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED: Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. TheClerks office shall immediately file Plaintiffs Lodged Complaint. Documents as indicated in the order mailed to the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service and Notice of Lawsuit) (HEG)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Andrew Saul, filed by Mikelann Reed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summonses) (JDH) Modified on 4/9/2021 to remove LODGED text as complaint is deemed filed. (HEG).
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis James P. O'Brien appearing for Plaintiff Mikelann Reed Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Saul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Edmund John Darcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikelann Reed
Represented By: James P. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?