Bowman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Michael J. Bowman
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00042
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File re #2 Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall file the Administrative Record and respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by August 16, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/17/2021. (HEG)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, Erin F. Highland appearing for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Highland, Erin)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO USMJ. (JDH)
May 25, 2021 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Pursuant to Standing Order DLC-51 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. (JDH)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy J. Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Eric Rasmusson, Erin F. Highland, Victoria L. Francis. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/14/2021. (ACC)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin F. Highland on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Highland, Erin)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew M. Saul. (JEH)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Documents mailed to parties as directed in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service and Notice of Lawsuit) (HEG)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Michael J. Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (JEH) Modified on 4/22/2021 to remove LODGED text as complaint is deemed filed (HEG).
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Eric Rasmusson appearing for Plaintiff Michael J. Bowman Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (JEH) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/21/2021) (JEH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Erin F. Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Bowman
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?