Portland General Electric Company et al v. NorthWestern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: PacifiCorp, Puget Sound Energy, Inc., Portland General Electric Company and Avista Corporation
Defendant: NorthWestern Corporation, Talen Montana, LLC and Austin Knudsen
Case Number: 1:2021cv00047
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc.. (Hansberry, Charles)
July 1, 2021 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc.. (Hansberry, Charles)
June 30, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek J. Oestreicher on behalf of Austin Knudsen (Oestreicher, Derek)
June 22, 2021 Filing 64 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint by Austin Knudsen. (Brown, Aislinn)
June 18, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc. (Hansberry, Charles)
June 18, 2021 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Portland General Electric Company. (Hansberry, Charles)
June 17, 2021 Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NorthWestern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix NW's Appendix in Support of its Response to Pltfs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Jackson, J.)
June 17, 2021 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Talen Montana, LLC. (Sterup, Robert)
June 17, 2021 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Talen Montana, LLC. (Sterup, Robert)
June 17, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint by Talen Montana, LLC. (Sterup, Robert)
June 17, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE by Austin Knudsen re #37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Brown, Aislinn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by NorthWestern Corporation. (Jackson, J.)
June 10, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah R. Langston on behalf of Austin Knudsen (Langston, Jeremiah)
June 10, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Aislinn W. Brown on behalf of Austin Knudsen (Brown, Aislinn)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re #51 Stipulation filed by NorthWestern Corporation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant NorthWestern Corporation is granted an extension of time through June 17, 2021 to file its response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 37). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/9/2021. (EMH)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Talen Montana, LLC and Austin Knudsen, Attorney General for the State of Montana, are granted an extension of time through June 17, 2021 for their respective responses to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 37). (EMH)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Defendant NorthWestern Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NorthWestern Corporation. (Jackson, J.)
June 8, 2021 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Joint Motion of Talen and Austin Knudsen Robert L. Sterup appearing for Defendant Talen Montana, LLC Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting motion) (Sterup, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Filing 49 Remark - Pro Hac Vice attorney Gregory F. Miller has registered and is able to electronically receive filings. (JEH)
June 4, 2021 Filing 48 Remark - Pro Hac Vice attorney Harry H. Schneider has registered and is able to electronically receive filings. (JEH)
June 4, 2021 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc. (Hansberry, Charles)
June 3, 2021 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #45 Brief/Memorandum in Support by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A enrolled bill SB265, #2 Exhibit B Pacific Northwest Owners FAC, #3 Exhibit C Talen Montana's FAC) (Hansberry, Charles) Modified on 6/9/2021 to reflect relationship created to #44 Motion (APP).
June 3, 2021 Filing 45 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc.. (Hansberry, Charles)
June 3, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiffs Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Hansberry, Charles)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory Miller; granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Harry Schneider. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 6/3/2021. (APP)
June 2, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION Harry Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2675618.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff Puget Sound Energy, Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Harry Schneider Declaration) (Hansberry, Charles)
June 2, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION Gregory Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2675597.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff Puget Sound Energy, Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Miller) (Hansberry, Charles)
June 2, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint by NorthWestern Corporation. (Jackson, J.)
May 27, 2021 Filing 39 APPENDIX re #37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Senate Bill 266 (ENROLLED BILL Authorized Print Version), #2 Declaration of Ronald J. Roberts, with Exhibits AB, #3 Declaration of Jason R. Thackston, #4 Declaration of Brett Greene, #5 Declaration of Mike Johanson, #6 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Hanson, with Exhibits AD) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 27, 2021 Filing 38 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc.. (Hansberry, Charles)
May 27, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiffs Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Hansberry, Charles)
May 27, 2021 Remark - PHV attorney David Markowitz is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JEH)
May 25, 2021 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to Austin Knudsen. (E-filed summons to be downloaded by Attorney for service) (EMH)
May 25, 2021 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Talen Montana, LLC on 05/05/2021, filed by Portland General Electric Company. (DeLuca, Dallas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on NorthWestern Corporation on 05/06/2021, filed by Portland General Electric Company. (DeLuca, Dallas)
May 24, 2021 Remark - PHV attorney Connie Martin is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JEH)
May 20, 2021 Filing 33 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Austin Knudsen, re #32 Amended Complaint (Hansberry, Charles)
May 20, 2021 Remark - PHV attorney William Schroeder is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JEH)
May 20, 2021 Remark - PHV attorney Harry Wilson is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JEH)
May 19, 2021 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Portland General Electric Company, PacifiCorp, Avista Corporation, Puget Sound Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A SB 266, #2 Exhibit B SB 265) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 19, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc. re #24 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #25 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #28 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #27 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #21 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #26 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #22 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Hansberry, Charles)
May 19, 2021 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NorthWestern Corporation. (Jackson, J.)
May 19, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by NorthWestern Corporation re #20 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jackson, J.)
May 19, 2021 Remark: PHV attorney Dallas DeLuca is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JDH)
May 19, 2021 Remark: PHV attorney Michael Andrea is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JDH)
May 19, 2021 Remark: PHV attorney Troy D. Greenfield is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JDH)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dallas DeLuca for Portland General Electric Company. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/18/2021. (CDH)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David B. Markowitz for Portland General Electric Company. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/18/2021. (CDH)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Harry B. Wilson for Portland General Electric Company. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/18/2021. (CDH)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William J. Schroeder for Avista Corporation. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/18/2021. (CDH)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael G. Andrea for Avista Corporation. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/18/2021. (CDH)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Troy D. Greenfield for PacifiCorp. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/18/2021. (CDH)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Connie Sue Martin for PacifiCorp. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/18/2021. (CDH)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey M. Hanson for Puget Sound Energy, Inc.. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/18/2021. (CDH)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. David Jackson for NorthWestern Corporation. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/18/2021. (CDH)
May 17, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION J David Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2665624.) Stephen D. Bell appearing for Defendant NorthWestern Corporation Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J David Jackson, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order) (Bell, Stephen)
May 14, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Puget Sound Energy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PPW Holdings, LLC for PacifiCorp; Corporate Parent Puget Equico LLC, Corporate Parent Puget Intermediate Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Puget Holdings LLC for Puget Sound Energy, Inc... (Hansberry, Charles)
May 14, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION Jeffrey M. Hanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2664917.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff Puget Sound Energy, Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Hanson) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 14, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION Connie Sue Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2664916.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff PacifiCorp Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Connie Sue Martin) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION Troy D. Greenfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2664915.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff PacifiCorp Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Troy D. Greenfield) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION Michael G. Andrea to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2664900.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff Avista Corporation Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. Andrea) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION William J. Schroeder to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2664897.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff Avista Corporation Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William J. Schroeder) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION Harry B. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2664880.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff Portland General Electric Company Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harry B. Wilson) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION David B. Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2664874.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff Portland General Electric Company Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David B. Markowitz) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION Dallas DeLuca to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2664871.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Plaintiff Portland General Electric Company Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dallas DeLuca) (Hansberry, Charles)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Hansberry on behalf of Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc. (Hansberry, Charles)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 Proof of Service - Service by Certified Mail to the Dept of Justice on 5/7/21. (APP)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Portland General Electric Company. (Zadick, Gary)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to serve a copy of Certification by certified mail upon the Honorable Austen Knudson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/5/2021. (APP) Modified on 5/5/2021 to reflect cert mailing sent (APP).
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to NorthWestern Corporation, Talen Montana, LLC. (E-filed summons to be downloaded by attorney for service) (EMH)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Avista Corporation, PacifiCorp, Portland General Electric Company, Puget Sound Energy, Inc. FRCP 5.1 Notice (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Zadick, Gary)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/27/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/27/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/27/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2021 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/4/2021. (SMD)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 Submission of Proposed Summons as to NorthWestern Corporation, Talen Montana, LLC, re #1 Complaint (Zadick, Gary)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NorthWestern Corporation, Talen Montana, LLC, filed by Portland General Electric Company, PacifiCorp, Avista Corporation, Puget Sound Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 SB 265, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEH)
May 4, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2659149. (JEH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portland General Electric Company et al v. NorthWestern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthWestern Corporation
Represented By: J. David Jackson
Represented By: Stephen D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talen Montana, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Sterup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Knudsen
Represented By: Aislinn W. Brown
Represented By: Derek J. Oestreicher
Represented By: Jeremiah R. Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PacifiCorp
Represented By: Connie Sue Martin
Represented By: Troy D. Greenfield
Represented By: Charles E. Hansberry
Represented By: Jenny M. Jourdonnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Sound Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory F. Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Hanson
Represented By: Harry H. Schneider
Represented By: Charles E. Hansberry
Represented By: Jenny M. Jourdonnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portland General Electric Company
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Dallas DeLuca
Represented By: Charles E. Hansberry
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Jenny M. Jourdonnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avista Corporation
Represented By: Charles E. Hansberry
Represented By: Jenny M. Jourdonnais
Represented By: William J. Schroeder
Represented By: Michael G. Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?