Braden et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Braden and Cynthia Braden
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv00053
Filed: May 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/27/2021. (AMC)
May 27, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian)
May 12, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (McIntosh, Ian)
May 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel Ian McIntosh for Richard B. North, Jr. by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (McIntosh, Ian)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/1/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/1/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/1/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/10/2021. (TXB)
May 9, 2021 Filing 19 DISCOVERY ORDERS FILED IN DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS FILED IN DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 17 MISCELLANEOUS ORDERS FILED IN DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 16 DAUBERT ORDERS FILED IN DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 15 MASTER AND SHORT FORM PLEADINGS FILED IN DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 14 DISCOVERY AND PRIVILEGE ORDERS FILED IN DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 13 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION ORDERS FILED IN DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION IN LIMINE ORDERS FILED IN DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 11 DOCKET SHEET FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 47 FROM DISTRICT OF ARIZONA. (JEH)
May 9, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-00047. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JEH, )
May 6, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Montana via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/9/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/9/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 *AMENDED by Doc. [7}--FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from azd on 5/9/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/9/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - (1) The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/9/2021.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21014 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/17/19. (MAP) *Modified on 4/15/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 5/9/2021.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-0047-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 5/9/2021.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13781452 filed by Kevin Braden, Cynthia Braden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 5/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braden et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Braden
Represented By: Brian Scott Katz
Represented By: Andrew W Callahan
Represented By: Laci M Whitley
Represented By: Jacob Alex Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Braden
Represented By: Brian Scott Katz
Represented By: Andrew W Callahan
Represented By: Laci M Whitley
Represented By: Jacob Alex Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?