Cowger v. Signal Peak Energy
Plaintiff: Justin Cowger
Defendant: Signal Peak Energy
Case Number: 1:2021cv00099
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michele L. Braukmann (Braukmann, Michele)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Signal Peak Energy. (Lopach, Paul)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Justin Cowger. (Braukmann, Michele)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Justin Cowger. (Braukmann, Michele)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Justin Cowger. (Braukmann, Michele)
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele L. Braukmann on behalf of Justin Cowger (Braukmann, Michele)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/11/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/11/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/11/2021. Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/27/2021. (JDH)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Matthew D. Braukmann, Paul J. Lopach.Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/15/2021. (SGN)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 Signal Peak Energy, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Signal Peak Energy. (Lopach, Paul)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Signal Peak Energy, filed by Justin Cowger. (JDH)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Signal Peak Energy, filed by Justin Cowger. (JDH)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT FILE: DV-33-2021-17-WS, MT 14th Judicial District Court, Musselshell County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. Original file held in the clerk's office on the open civil case shelf. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDH)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Signal Peak Energy identifying Corporate Parent Boich Companies, Corporate Parent FirstEnergy Corp., Corporate Parent Global Mining Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Pinesdale LLC, Corporate Parent Global Mining Group, LLC for Signal Peak Energy.. (Lopach, Paul)
September 20, 2021 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2730342 (AMC)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Signal Peak Energy from Musselshell County State Court case number DV-33-2021-17-WS filed by Signal Peak Energy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B, First Amended Complaint in State Court, #3 Exhibit C Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowger v. Signal Peak Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Cowger
Represented By: Matthew D. Braukmann
Represented By: Michele L. Braukmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal Peak Energy
Represented By: Paul J. Lopach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?