Chalupa v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Shaina E. Chalupa
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv00042
Filed: April 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Kilolo Kijakazi waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. (APP)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to Standing Order DLC-51 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. (APP)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (APP)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Burdett on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Burdett, David)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis request to waive service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service) (APP) Mailed to Defs
April 29, 2022 Filing 3 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/13/2022. (APP)
April 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Shaina E. Chalupa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Acting U.S. Attorney for District of Montana, #3 Summons for Acting Commissioner of Social Security, #4 Summons for U.S. Attorney General) (JLE) Modified on 4/29/2022 to remove "Lodged" from entry (APP).
April 28, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Shaina E. Chalupa Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chalupa v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaina E. Chalupa
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: David Burdett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?