McLaughlin v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Diane J. McLaughlin
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv00116
Filed: October 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Martin on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Martin, Justin)
October 27, 2022 Set Deadline: Kilolo Kijakazi answer due 12/24/2022. (JLE)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (JLE)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of Service) (Copies mailed to the Acting Commissioner of SSA, US Attorney General and US Attorney on this date as directed in the Order.) (JLE)
October 18, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Diane J. McLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons US Atty, #3 Proposed Summons Atty General, #4 Proposed Summons SSA Commissioner) (JLE) Modified on 10/21/2022: IFP granted. Complaint deemed filed (JDH).
October 18, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Diane J. McLaughlin (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaughlin v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane J. McLaughlin
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Represented By: Justin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?