Kaiser v. Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lillian Walters Kaiser
Defendant: Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. and William D. Walters, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00059
Filed: May 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2023 Filing 88 RESPONSE to Motion re #74 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Odegaard, Paul)
July 20, 2023 Filing 87 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #86 MOTION Involuntary Dissolution of Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit) (Odegaard, Paul)
July 20, 2023 Filing 86 MOTION Involuntary Dissolution of Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. . Paul D. Odegaard appearing for Plaintiff Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Odegaard, Paul)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING #76 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/20/2023. (AMC) Modified on 7/20/2023 to add link to the motion (AMC).
July 20, 2023 Filing 84 MOTION for Hearing re #74 MOTION to Appoint Receiver . Paul D. Odegaard appearing for Plaintiff Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Odegaard, Paul)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER, It has come to the Court's attention that a Status Conference was previously set for Wednesday, July 19, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. Therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the telephonic status conference set for Tuesday, August 1, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/14/2023. (EMH)
July 14, 2023 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Odegaard, Paul)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order Setting: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/1/2023 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/14/2023. (EMH)
July 7, 2023 Filing 80 RESPONSE to Motion re #74 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by William D. Walters, Jr. (Crist, John)
July 7, 2023 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Motion re #74 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Nicholas C. Grant in Support of Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Motion to Appoint Receiver re: Document 74 with Exhibits 1-18, #2 Affidavit Declaration of William D. Walters, Jr. with Exhibits A-D, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Carrie A. (Walters) Smith) (Grant, Nicholas)
July 6, 2023 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion re #76 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by William D. Walters, Jr. (Crist, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 77 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #76 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Odegaard, Paul)
June 23, 2023 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Paul D. Odegaard appearing for Plaintiff Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Odegaard, Paul)
June 23, 2023 Filing 75 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #74 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit) (Odegaard, Paul)
June 23, 2023 Filing 74 MOTION to Appoint Receiver . Paul D. Odegaard appearing for Plaintiff Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Odegaard, Paul)
June 21, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Lillian Walters Kaiser re #62 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification Under Rule 8.5 of the Montana Rules of Professional Conduct) (Phillips, David)
June 21, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by William D. Walters, Jr (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification Under Rule 8.5 of the Montana Rules of Professional Conduct) (Schultz, Samuel)
June 21, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by William D. Walters, Jr (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification Under Rule 8.5 of the Montana Rules of Professional Conduct) (Zuger, Jack)
June 21, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by William D. Walters, Jr (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification Under Rule 8.5 of the Montana Rules of Professional Conduct) (Gleekel, Peter)
June 15, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Lillian Walters Kaiser in Support of Application for Admission (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification Under Rule 8.5 of the Montana Rules of Professional Conduct) (Bakke, Randall)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jack E. Zuger for William D. Walters, Jr. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/29/2023. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/14/2023. (AMC)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter J Gleekel for William D. Walters, Jr. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/28/2023. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/13/2023. (AMC)
June 13, 2023 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION Jack E. Zuger to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3084696.). John G. Crist appearing for Defendant William D. Walters, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jack E. Zuger, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Crist, John)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Samuel Schultz for William D. Walters, Jr. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/28/2023. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/13/2023. (AMC)
June 13, 2023 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION Samuel H.J. Schultz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3084413.). John G. Crist appearing for Defendant William D. Walters, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Samuel H.J. Schultz, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Crist, John)
June 13, 2023 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION Peter J. Gleekel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3084407.). John G. Crist appearing for Defendant William D. Walters, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Peter J. Gleekel, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Crist, John)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David R. Phillips for Lillian Walters Kaiser. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/28/2023. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/13/2023. (AMC)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randall J. Bakke for Lillian Walters Kaiser. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/28/2023. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/13/2023. (AMC)
June 13, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Crist on behalf of William D. Walters, Jr (Crist, John)
June 12, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION David R. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3083720.). Paul D. Odegaard appearing for Plaintiff Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Odegaard, Paul)
June 12, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION Randall J. Bakke to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3083697.). Paul D. Odegaard appearing for Plaintiff Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Odegaard, Paul)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/19/2023 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/6/2023. (AMC)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/14/2023 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/5/2023. (AMC)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/7/2023 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/31/2023. (AMC)
May 30, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas C Grant on behalf of Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. (Grant, Nicholas)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that Counsel for the Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a notice of appearance stating their standing with the State Bar of Montana. In lieu of bar membership to the State Bar of Montana, Plaintiff and Defendants shall arrange for local counsel, who must file a notice of appearance within 30 days, or Friday, June 30, 2023. Local counsel may then move for pro hac vice admission of out-of-state counsel consistent with L.R. 83.1 ( d). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/30/2023. (EMH)
May 26, 2023 Filing 52 Case transferred in from District of North Dakota; Case Number 1:22-cv-00166. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (AMC, )
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor ; granting 21 Motion to Change Venue; granting 22 Motion to Change Venue; and denying 30 Motion for Hearing. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Montana. (CK) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
May 24, 2023 Case transferred to District of Montana. (mf) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
April 19, 2023 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT of Randall J. Bakke re #49 Reply to Response to Motion by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email chain between attorney Nick Grant and Randall Bakke, #2 Exhibit B - email chain between attorney Peter Gleekel and Randall Bakke)(Bakke, Randall) (Attachment 1 and 2 replaced on 4/20/2023 to remove overlapping headers). NEF Regenerated. (sj). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
April 19, 2023 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Protective Order filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Bakke, Randall) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
April 13, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #48 RESPONSE. Modified entry to add filer: Imperial Oil of North Dakota. (sc) Modified to correct typographical error on 4/13/2023. NEF regenerated (sc). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
April 12, 2023 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Protective Order Defendants' Joint Responsive Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Protective Order filed by William D. Walters, Jr. and Imperial Oil of North Dakota (Gleekel, Peter) Modified to add filer on 4/13/2023 (sc). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
April 5, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #47 REPLY to Response to Motion. Clerk's office cleaned up docket text to remove reference to unnecessary motion relief and added additional defendant as filer. (sc) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
April 4, 2023 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Stay Joint Motion of Defendants William D. Walters, Jr. and Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. to Stay Discovery filed by William D. Walters, Jr. and Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. (Gleekel, Peter) Modified to clean up docket text and add filer on 4/5/2023 (sc). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support re #45 MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Protective Order filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Bakke, Randall) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Protective Order by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Bakke, Randall) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 29, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #40 Reply to Response to Motion. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Response to Motion at #44 ; re: #41 Affidavit of Randall J. Bakke, #42 Declaration of Shannon Street. Clerk's Office corrected links. (cjs) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 28, 2023 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Stay Joint Motion of Defendants William D. Walters, Jr. and Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. to Stay Discovery filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (cjs) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 28, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Regarding Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Shannon Street, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A to the Declaration of Shannon Street, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit C to the Declaration of Shannon Street, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Affidavit of Randall J. Bakke, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit B to the Affidavit of Randall J. Bakke)(Bakke, Randall) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 28, 2023 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration) of Shannon Street re #44 Response to Motion, by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Email for Bill Walters dated September 6, 2018)(Bakke, Randall) Modified on 3/29/2023 to correct link (cjs). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 28, 2023 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Randall J. Bakke re #44 Response to Motion, by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -correspondence dated February 2, 2023 from counsel for Imperial Oil to counsel for Plaintiff)(Bakke, Randall) Modified on 3/29/2023 to correct link (cjs). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 28, 2023 Filing 40 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Stay Joint Motion of Defendants William D. Walters, Jr. and Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. to Stay Discovery filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Bakke, Randall) Modified on 3/29/2023 to restrict access (cjs). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 20, 2023 Filing 39 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Status Conference held on 3/20/2023. (BG) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 15, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #37 Motion to Stay and Motion for Discovery and #38 Memorandum in Support. Modified entries to remove unnecessary motion relief and to clean up docket text. (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 14, 2023 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support re #37 MOTION to Stay Joint Motion of Defendants William D. Walters, Jr. and Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. to Stay Discovery filed by William D. Walters, Jr. (Gleekel, Peter) Modified on 3/15/2023 to remove unnecessary motion relief and cleaned up docket text. (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
March 14, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay Joint Motion of Defendants William D. Walters, Jr. and Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. to Stay Discovery, by William D. Walters, Jr. (Gleekel, Peter) Modified on 3/15/2023 to remove unnecessary motion relief and cleaned up docket text. (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (Text Only) ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/20/2023 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
February 24, 2023 Filing 34 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Bakke, Randall) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER transferring to Western Division and for reassignment by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (JS) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
January 30, 2023 Case transferred in from North Dakota (Eastern) Division on 01/30/2023 Case Number 3:22-cv-166. (pb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
January 18, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #32 Reply to Response to Motion. Clerk's office added link. (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
January 17, 2023 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative to transfer Venue , 22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 1/18/2023 to add link. (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
January 11, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk's Office corrected link. (cjs) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re: #19 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue. Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.'s Reply due by 1/17/2023. (AS) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Motion to Dismiss 22 Motion to Change Venue by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 1/11/2023 to correct link (cjs). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
January 10, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #28 Reply to Response. Clerk's office added link; re: #16 Motion to Dismiss. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed Motion for Hearing at 30 . (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
January 9, 2023 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or to Transfer Venue, 21 MOTION to Change Venue filed by William D. Walters, Jr. (Gleekel, Peter) Modified on 1/10/2023 to add link. (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #23 Joint Motion for Consolidated Briefing and Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff may file a consolidated brief, not exceeding 55 pages, in response to defendants' motions to dismiss. (KT) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Randall J. Bakke re #24 Response to Motion, by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- correspondence dated June 3, 2022 from counsel for Plaintiff to counsel for Imperial Oil, #2 Exhibit 2- correspondence dated June 10, 2022 from counsel for Imperial Oil, #3 Exhibit 3-correspondence dated June 15, 2022 from counsel for Plaintiff to counsel for Imperial Oil, #4 Exhibit 4-email correspondence dated June 15, 2022 from the attorney for Imperial Oil, Nicholas Grant, #5 Exhibit 5-correspondence dated July 28, 2022, from counsel for Plaintiff to counsel for Imperial Oil, #6 Exhibit 6-correspondence dated August 8, 2022 from Imperial Oil attorney Nick Grant, #7 Exhibit 7-memo from Eide Bailley rejecting demand, #8 Exhibit 8-correspondence dated August 12, 2022 from Plaintiffs counsel to Imperial Oils counsel, #9 Exhibit 9-email string between Nick Grant and counsel for Plaintiff, #10 Exhibit 10-correspondence dated September 2, 2022 from counsel for Imperial Oil to counsel for Plaintiff, #11 Exhibit 11-Criminal Judgment against Barbara Langerud, #12 Exhibit 12-relevant pages of the March 20, 2020 Parole Board special meeting minutes regarding the parole of Barbara Langerud (redacted))(Bakke, Randall) (Attachment 2 and 9 replaced on 12/28/2022 to remove overlapping headers). NEF Regenerated. (sj). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration ) of Shannon Street re #24 Response to Motion, by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Bakke, Randall) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative to transfer Venue, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or to Transfer Venue, 22 MOTION to Change Venue, 21 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Bakke, Randall) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Motion for Consolidated Briefing (Assented to) by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Bakke, Randall) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 6, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION RE: #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Clerk's Office docketed a separate motion for each entry. See Doc. 21 and 22 MOTION to Change Venue. RE: #17 and #20 MEMORANDUM in Support. Clerk's Office added links. RE: #18 Affidavit. Clerk's Office added a link and removed duplicative "Ex" from attachment description. Docket entries were cleaned up. (sj) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Hearing re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or to Transfer Venue by William D. Walters, Jr. See document #16 . (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Change Venue by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. See Doc No. #19 . (sj) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Change Venue by William D. Walters, Jr. See Doc No. #16 . (sj) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re 22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 12/6/2022 to add link and clean up docket text. (sj). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative to transfer Venue by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Peter J. Gleekel re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re #17 MEMORANDUM in Support, re 21 MOTION to Change Venue by William D. Walters, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trust Agreement)(Gleekel, Peter) Modified on 12/6/2022 to add link, remove duplicative "Ex" to attachment description and clean up docket text. (sj). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re 21 MOTION to Change Venue filed by William D. Walters, Jr. (Gleekel, Peter) Modified on 12/6/2022 to add link and clean up docket text. (sj). [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or to Transfer Venue by William D. Walters, Jr. (Gleekel, Peter) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 15, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #14 Certificate of Service. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Acknowledgement of Service at #15 . (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. William D. Walters, Jr served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lillian Walters Kaiser re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (Bakke, Randall) Modified on 11/15/2022 to restrict access. (jb) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Schultz on behalf of William D. Walters, Jr (Schultz, Samuel) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc., answer due 12/5/2022. (AS) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 11, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Gleekel on behalf of William D. Walters, Jr (Gleekel, Peter) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #7 Stipulation for an Extension of Time to Answer. William D. Walters Jr. answer due by 12/5/2022. (AS) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by William D. Walters, Jr. (Zuger, Jack) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack E. Zuger on behalf of William D. Walters, Jr (Zuger, Jack) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge to the case. by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.(sc) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (sc) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lillian Walters Kaiser. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/28/2022. (sc) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
October 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc., William D. Walters, Jr. (sc) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]
October 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc., William D. Walters, Jr (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000174) filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sc) [Transferred from ndd on 5/26/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaiser v. Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Walters Kaiser
Represented By: David R. Phillips
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: David Ray Phillips
Represented By: Randall J Bakke
Represented By: Paul D. Odegaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas C Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Walters, Jr.
Represented By: Jack E. Zuger
Represented By: Peter J Gleekel
Represented By: Samuel Schultz
Represented By: Jack Zuger
Represented By: John G. Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?