Cullum et al v. BNSF Railway Co. et al
Plaintiff: Chad Cullum, Shala Cullum and Mike George
Defendant: BNSF Railway Co. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv00082
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2023. Discovery due by 5/8/2024. Motions due by 7/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/14/2023. (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES.) (JLE)
September 14, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/14/2023. (McKee, Benjamin)
September 8, 2023 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by BNSF Railway Co.. (Friend, Michelle)
September 7, 2023 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Chad Cullum, Shala Cullum, Mike George. (Bechtold, Timothy)
September 7, 2023 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by BNSF Railway Co.. (Friend, Michelle)
September 7, 2023 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by BNSF Railway Co.. (Friend, Michelle)
September 7, 2023 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by BNSF Railway Co.. (Friend, Michelle)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/9/2023. (JLE)
August 1, 2023 Filing 9 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
July 27, 2023 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
July 25, 2023 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Chad Cullum, Mike George, Shala Cullum. (JLE)
July 25, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED from MT 22nd Judicial District Court, Carbon Co., case number DV-23-61. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JLE)
July 25, 2023 Filing 5 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/8/2023. (JLE)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES.Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2023 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/7/2023. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/7/2023. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/25/2023. (JLE)
July 24, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Co.. (Friend, Michelle)
July 24, 2023 Filing 2 BNSF's Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Co.. (Friend, Michelle)
July 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BNSF Railway Co. from MT 22nd Judicial District Court, Carbon Co., case number DV 23-61, filed by BNSF Railway Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JLE)
July 17, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-3099155. (PAID IN SHELL CASE) (JLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cullum et al v. BNSF Railway Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Cullum
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shala Cullum
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike George
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Co.
Represented By: Michelle T. Friend
Represented By: Benjamin O. Rechtfertig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?