McWilliams v. Garfield County et al
Plaintiff: Erin McWilliams
Defendant: Garfield County, Garfield County Healthcare Center, Garfiel County Healthcare Center Board of Directors and Garfield County Healthcare Center Board of Directors
Case Number: 1:2023cv00097
Filed: August 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/20/2023. (JLE)
October 20, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by Erin McWilliams. (Nelson, Kyle)
October 18, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay . Molenda Lee McCarty appearing for Defendants Garfield County, Garfield County Healthcare Center, Garfield County Healthcare Center Board of Directors. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McCarty, Molenda)
October 17, 2023 Filing 17 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Erin McWilliams. (Nelson, Kyle)
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Erin McWilliams. (Nelson, Kyle)
October 17, 2023 Filing 15 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Erin McWilliams. (Nelson, Kyle)
October 17, 2023 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Garfield County, Garfield County Healthcare Center, Garfield County Healthcare Center Board of Directors. (McCarty, Molenda)
September 28, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine B. DeLong on behalf of Erin McWilliams (DeLong, Katherine)
September 8, 2023 Filing 12 STATE COURT RECUSAL AND ORDER CALLING IN JUDGE. (JDH)
September 8, 2023 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECUSAL AND ORDER CALLING IN JUDGE - DECLINED. (JDH)
September 8, 2023 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in State Court (MT 16th Judicial District Court) against Garfield County, Garfield County Healthcare Center, Garfield County Healthcare Center Board of Directors, filed by Erin McWilliams. (JDH)
September 8, 2023 Filing 9 COMPLAINT filed in State Court (MT 16th Judicial District Court) against Garfield County, Garfield County Healthcare Center, Garfield County Healthcare Center Board of Directors, filed by Erin McWilliams. (JDH)
September 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED from MT 16th Judicial District Court - Garfield County, case number DV-17-2023-08-DK. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDH)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER WITHHOLDING CONSENT. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/6/2023. (JDH)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement, Joint Discovery Plan and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/17/2023. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), lead trial counsel for the respective parties, and any individual proceeding pro se, shall report to the chambers of the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge, at the James F. Battin Federal Courthouse, 2601 2nd Avenue North, Suite 5500, Billings, Montana on October 24, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. for the purpose of participating in a preliminary pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/30/2023. (HEG)
August 29, 2023 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Garfield County, Garfield County Healthcare Center, Garfield County Healthcare Center Board of Directors. (McCarty, Molenda)
August 25, 2023 Filing 2 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/8/2023. (JDH)
August 24, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garfield County, Garfield County Healthcare Center, Garfield County Healthcare Center Board of Directors from MT 16th Judicial Court, case number DV-2023-08, filed by Garfield County, Garfield County Healthcare Center, Garfield County Healthcare Center Board of Directors. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Notice of Filing, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH)
August 24, 2023 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-3118995 (JDH)
August 24, 2023 Judge Susan P. Watters and Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan added. (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McWilliams v. Garfield County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin McWilliams
Represented By: Kyle W. Nelson
Represented By: Hannah S Willstein
Represented By: Katherine B. DeLong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County
Represented By: Molenda Lee McCarty
Represented By: Maureen H. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County Healthcare Center
Represented By: Maureen H. Lennon
Represented By: Molenda Lee McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfiel County Healthcare Center Board of Directors
Represented By: Molenda Lee McCarty
Represented By: Maureen H. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County Healthcare Center Board of Directors
Represented By: Maureen H. Lennon
Represented By: Molenda Lee McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?