Giacometto Ranch Inc. v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Giacometto Ranch Inc.
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation, Denbury Inc., Denbury Onshore LLC. and Denbury Operating Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv00138
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
2 Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Manning, Michael)
January 16, 2024 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Manning, Michael)
January 16, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Michael P. Manning appearing for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Manning, Michael)
January 11, 2024 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Denbury Inc., Denbury Onshore LLC., Denbury Operating Company identifying Corporate Parent Denbury Inc. for Denbury Inc., Denbury Onshore LLC., Denbury Operating Company.. (Dyre, Jon)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 Denbury Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Denbury Inc., Denbury Onshore LLC., Denbury Operating Company. (Dyre, Jon)
January 9, 2024 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings-Acknowledgment of PHV Order 12/21/2023. (APP)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/18/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/18/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/18/2024. Zoom Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2024 at 10:30 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/4/2024. (APP) SEND OUT ZOOM INFO
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giacometto Ranch Inc.. Denbury Inc. served on 12/18/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (Braaten, Derrick)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giacometto Ranch Inc.. Exxon Mobil Corporation served on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024. (Braaten, Derrick)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giacometto Ranch Inc.. Denbury Operating Company served on 12/15/2023, answer due 1/5/2024. (Braaten, Derrick)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giacometto Ranch Inc.. Denbury Onshore LLC. served on 12/15/2023, answer due 1/5/2024. (Braaten, Derrick)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Giacometto Ranch Inc. re #7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Braaten, Derrick)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (APP)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 Submission of Proposed Summons as to all defendants, re #1 Complaint (Braaten, Derrick) Modified on 12/6/2023 to correct text (AMC).
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Giacometto Ranch Inc.. (Braaten, Derrick)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Derrick L. Braaten. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 12/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/6/2023. (SGN)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION Derrick Braaten to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Giacometto Ranch Inc. ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3172336.). Kai Bjorn Thorsgard appearing for Plaintiff Giacometto Ranch Inc.. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Derrick Braaten) (Thorsgard, Kai)
November 29, 2023 REMINDER to counsel Derrick Braaten : pursuant to LR. 83.1 he must file a motion and be granted leave to appear pro hac vice before he will be added to the docket in the case and receive notices. (AMC)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is assigned to the Honorable Susan P. Watters, and referred to United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/27/2023. (EMH)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 REMINDER: Non-governmental corporate parties in civil cases are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements at the time of their initial appearance. The statement should disclose parent corporations and any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of the filing parties stock or state that no such corporate relationship exists. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a) and (b). (APP)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/27/2023. (KLD notification added) (EMH)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/27/2023. (Copy of order emailed to BMM Chambers.) (JLE)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed against All Defendants by Giacometto Ranch Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unit Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - MTBOG Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)
November 22, 2023 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 402, receipt number 181924 (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giacometto Ranch Inc. v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giacometto Ranch Inc.
Represented By: Derrick Braaten
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Represented By: Kai Bjorn Thorsgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Michael P. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denbury Inc.
Represented By: Jon T. Dyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denbury Onshore LLC.
Represented By: Jon T. Dyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denbury Operating Company
Represented By: Jon T. Dyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?