USA v. Atlantic Richfield, et al

Case Number: 2:1989cv00039
Filed: June 23, 1989
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 42:6901 Resource & Recovery Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2016 1158 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Montana Standard's Motion 1130 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/7/2016. (HEG)
November 16, 2016 1153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. On 11/16/16 the Court conducted a hearing on its previously issued Order to Show Cause. Upon the record made in open court: ORDERED: The Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/16/2016. (ELL, )
November 15, 2016 1150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1149 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/30/2016. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/15/2016. (ELL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Atlantic Richfield, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?