Morrill et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Judy Morrill and Tom Morrill
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2015cv00007
Filed: February 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims of the plaintiffs, Judy Morrill and Tom Morrill, against the defendant United States of America, are dismissed with prejudice as fully compromised and settled on the merits, each party to bear their own costs and expenses. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/20/2017. (ELL)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Clarify. Pursuant to the US unopposed motion for clarification, the Order issued by this Court on 6/26/17 (Doc #10 is amended to reflect the following change. Discovery shall close on July 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/11/2017. (ELL)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear by telephone at PPTC on 11/16/16 at 3:30 p.m. The Court will initiate the preliminary pretrial conference call. The Court will contact the parties with the call in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/10/2016. (ELL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrill et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Morrill
Represented By: Jeffrey Wade Dahood
Represented By: Wade Dahood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Morrill
Represented By: Jeffrey Wade Dahood
Represented By: Wade Dahood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?