Eaton et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Max Eaton and Gail Sanchez-Eaton
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2015cv00045
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims between Plaintiff and Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their respective fees and costs. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/3/2017. (ELL)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 19 Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Scheduling Order (Doc 19) currently in effect in this case and as amended is VACATED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/1/2017. (ELL)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the PPTC scheduled for 11/30/16 is RESET for 12/1/16 at 10:00 am BY TELEPHONE. BOTH parties will appear by telephone. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/7/2016. (ELL, ) Modified on 11/7/2016 to update date of PPTC (ELL, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Eaton
Represented By: Tom W. Stonecipher
Represented By: Margaret C. Weamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Sanchez-Eaton
Represented By: Tom W. Stonecipher
Represented By: Margaret C. Weamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?