United States of America v. Tarpey et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James Tarpey, Project Philanthropy, Timeshare Closings, Ron Boyles, Curt Thor and Suzanne Crowson
Case Number: 2:2015cv00072
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Ron Broyles. (ELL) Modified on 3/29/2017 Cpy mailed to Broyles (ELL).
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re 106 Motion Hearing. ORDERED: 1. Crowley Fleck PLLP shall remain as cnsl for Broyles pending Broyles securing the appearance for him of another attorney or by Broyles' appearance pro se, on or before November 18, 2016. 2. Crowley Fleck PLLP will be relieved of further responsibility as counsel for Broyles upon the filing of a notice of appearance of another attorney for Broyles or by Broyles' appearance pro se as required by LR 83.8 on or before November 18, 2016. 3. Cnsl for Broyles is directed to serve him with notice of lthis Order. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/2/2016. (ELL, )
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 102 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. (See Order for Complete Details) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/27/2016. (ELL, )
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 79 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ORDERED: 1. Broyles was given the opportunity to amend his crossclaim to "get it right". He has failed to do so. An additional leave to further amend will not be accorded. 2. The renewed motions to dismiss Broyles crossclaim filed by James Tarpey, Project Philanthropy, and Timeshare Closings are each and all GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/29/2016. (ELL, )
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against James Tarpey (ELL, )
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants' James Tarpey and Timeshare Closings, Inc. d/b/a Resort Closings, Inc. Motion to Dismiss Defendant Ron Broyles' Crossclaim and Defendant Project Philanthropy, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendant Ron Broyles' Crossclaim are GRANTED, subject to leave to and including July 22, 2016, in which to file an amended crossclaim meeting the pleadings requirement of Twombly and Iqbal, and current Ninth Circuit precedent. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/11/2016. (ELL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tarpey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Harris Phillips
Represented By: Richard G. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tarpey
Represented By: Robert M. McCallum
Represented By: Joel E. Silverman
Represented By: Diane E. Tebelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Philanthropy
Represented By: Robert M. McCallum
Represented By: Joel E. Silverman
Represented By: Diane E. Tebelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timeshare Closings
Represented By: Robert M. McCallum
Represented By: Joel E. Silverman
Represented By: Diane E. Tebelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Thor
Represented By: William V. Ballew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Crowson
Represented By: Robert M. McCallum
Represented By: Joel E. Silverman
Represented By: Diane E. Tebelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?