Bertelsen v. Citimortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Charles Bertelsen
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2016cv00002
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Attorney Fees Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/26/2017. (ELL)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Citimortgage, Inc. against Jonathan Charles Bertelsen Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/7/2017. (ELL)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Compel Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/16/2017. (TCL)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part, and denying in part 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Citimortgage, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/14/2016. (TCL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bertelsen v. Citimortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Charles Bertelsen
Represented By: Robert Farris-Olsen
Represented By: Brian J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Represented By: Michelle Millhollin Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?