Lucas et al v. BT-OH et al
Plaintiff: Troy Lucas and Jackie Lucas
Defendant: BT-OH and Montbill
Case Number: 2:2016cv00012
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Vacate. Upon Pla's Conditional Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, Vacate Trial and Set Telephonic Status Conf (75) and with good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conf and Jury Trial in this matter are VACATED. A telephonic status conf is set for Wednesday, August 23, 2017 at 2:30 pm. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in-number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/16/2017. (ELL)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/15/2017. (ELL)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motion Hearing and Status Conference set for Thursday, July 27, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. will now be held at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/13/2017. (SLL)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/23/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas et al v. BT-OH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Lucas
Represented By: Monte D. Beck
Represented By: Anthony F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Lucas
Represented By: Monte D. Beck
Represented By: Anthony F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BT-OH
Represented By: Steven S. Carey
Represented By: David T. Lighthall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?