Dun et al v. Transamerica Premier Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: William Dun, Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, Pat Ruggieri and Dora Mengel
Defendant: Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company and Does I-V
Case Number: 2:2016cv00023
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 62 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to transfer this matter to the Federal District Court of the District of Columbia (Doc. 58 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/2/2019. (NOS)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney S. Micah Salb for Irene Dun, Sheryl Dun, William Dun, Dora Mengel, and Pat Ruggieri. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/3/2018. (NOS)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER amending June 19, 2018, Order. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/15/2018. (ASG)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for AEGON Direct Marketing Services,Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for Financial Planning Services,Markham R. Leventhal ,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company.; granting 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for AEGON Direct Marketing Services,Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for Financial Planning Services,Markham R. Leventhal,Shaunda Patterson-Strachan for Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/1/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/17/2017. (ELL)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear at the preliminary pretrial conference by conference call. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the preliminary pretrial conference set for February 16, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Great Falls, MT, shall be held by telephone. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in information. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/9/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dun et al v. Transamerica Premier Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dun
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Dun
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Dun
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Ruggieri
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Mengel
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Annie Harris
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-V
Represented By: Annie Harris
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?