Jeager v. Genesis Healthcare
Plaintiff: Gina Jaeger
Defendant: Genesis Healthcare, John Doe LLC's and John Doe, Inc.'s 1-10
Case Number: 2:2016cv00030
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Peak Medical Montana Operations against Gina Jaeger. (HEG)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDERED: On or before June 21, 2019, Defendant shall file a petition for approval of the arbitrator's order and such other and further documents as may be necessary and appropriate to final resolution of the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/23/2019. (HEG)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDERED: On or before March 1, 2019, the parties will provide the Court with a joint status report addressing: (1) whether arbitration was conducted starting on January 21, 2019, as stated; (2) whether a decision in arbitration has been entered; and (3) if no decision has been entered, when, if known, a decision is to be expected. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/25/2019. (HEG)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Compel. 1. Peak's Motion to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED. 2. All proceedings in this case are stayed under 9 USC Section 3 pending arbitration. 3. The ppt conf set for 3/15/17 is VACATED to be reset if appropri ate by further order of the court. 4. Beginning within 3 months of the date of this Order, and every three months thereafter, the parties shall file a joint status report in this case to update the Court as to the progress of arbitration. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/10/2017. (ELL)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The caption is amended to reflect dismissal of Genesis Healthcare, Inc. Siggned by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/13/2017. (ELL)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDERED: 1. Pla Motion to Remand Under 28 USC 1447(e) is DENIED 35 . 2. Defendants William Powell, Dana Waddell and Amber Dayhuff are DISMISSED without prejudice. The caption is amended to reflect dismissal of the three individual Defendants. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/6/2017. (ELL)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 59 Notice of Submitting Proposed Order. Counsel are apprised the Court is not disposed to approval of any protective order that is inconsistent with and that does not include, inconsistent the following language: Please review Order for complete details. The Parties are invited to consider resubmission of the proposed order. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/21/2016. (HEG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeager v. Genesis Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Jaeger
Represented By: William Berger
Represented By: Torger S. Oaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Healthcare
Represented By: Brett Patrick Clark
Represented By: Kiely V. Keane
Represented By: Charles K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe LLC's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, Inc.'s 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?