Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. The Estate of Craig Michael Fisher et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: The Estate of Craig Michael Fisher and Howard Taylor Smith, II
Case Number: 2:2016cv00036
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDERED: The above-entitled action is dismissed with prejudice, as fully settled upon its merits, each party to pay his own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/29/2018. (HEG)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 54 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/11/2018. (NOS)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 51 Motion in Limine without Prejudice to renewal in proper form. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/10/2018. (HEG)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDERED: Necessary and appropriate revisions to the preliminary pretrial statements sto address the deficiencies outlined in paragraphs 1 and 2 above shall be filed on or before May 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/8/2017. (ELL)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. See order for complete details. Copy of Order provided to Finance. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/23/2017. (HEG)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 13 MOTION for Leave to File to Deposit Insurance Proceeds filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendants are enjoined and restrained from instituting or prosecuting any proceeding in any state or United States Court affecting the insurance policy proceeds at issue in this interpleader action until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/27/2016. (ELL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. The Estate of Craig Michael Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott G. Gratton
Represented By: Adam M. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Craig Michael Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Taylor Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?