Cox et al v. NorthWestern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Reece Cox and Jody Hertzog
Defendant: NorthWestern Corporation and Does 1-25
Case Number: 2:2016cv00047
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant NorthWestern Corporation and against Plaintiffs Reece Cox and Jody Hertzog. (SLR)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Court to Treat Motion for Summary Judgment as Timely Filed, denying 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/16/2018. (NOS)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to L.R. 72.2(b), that this case is referred to United States Magistrate Judge John Johnston for the purpose of conducting mediation between the parties. Arrangements for setting the conference will be made by Judge Johnston. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/31/2018. (NOS)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Pending before the Court are Defendant's motions to quash and Plaintiffs' motion to compel. Documents 26 , 30 , and 35 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on April 5, 2018, the parties shall file a statement with supporting affidavit(s) detailing the attorney fees and costs they have incurred through April 5, 2018, in prosecuting and defending these motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/28/2018. (MMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. NorthWestern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reece Cox
Represented By: Todd A. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Hertzog
Represented By: Todd A. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthWestern Corporation
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?