Tolliver-McGregor v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Montana, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wendy Tolliver-McGregor
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Montana, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00058
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDERED: This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear theirown costs and fees. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/10/2019. (HEG)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDERED: The briefing schedule and all deadlines are VACATED. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal and proposed order of dismissal within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/10/2019. (HEG)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDERED: Defendant's Unopposed Local Rule 5.1 (b) Motion for Leave to File Protected Health Information Under Seal is GRANTED subject to and upon the conditions of the Agreed Protective Order,issued March 3, 2017, including Paragraph 12, which states that "[a]ll parties understand that all documents relied upon by the Court in resolving any issue before the Court, including documents filed under seal, will be made public contemporaneously with the Court's ruling on the issue." Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/26/2019. (HEG)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDERED: The parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend the Proposed Final Pretrial Order is GRANTED. The parties shall have to and including June 7, 2019, in which to file the proposed final pretrial order. All other deadlines remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/10/2019. (HEG)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: the Plain Meaning of "Will Consult With" & Breach of Contract; denying 94 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 97 Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence not Befor e BCBSMT When it Made its Determination that Plaintiff's In-Patient Rehabilitation Stay at Craig Hospital was not Medically Necessary; 99 Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Financial Hardship is withdrawn; granting 101 Mo tion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude References to Prior Judicial Opinions Regarding Dr. Howard Choi; granting 103 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Gregory Munro and Cori Cook; granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion in Limine to Ex clude the Testimony of Michael Ridgeway; granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion in Limine re: After-Acquired Evidence & the Testimony of Morgan Lorio, M.D. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/4/2019. See Order for further details. (NOS) (Docket text added.) (NOS)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDERED: Plaintiffs counsel may bring his cell phone to the motions hearing set for April 4, 2019. The phone shall be brought to the hearing turned off and may only be turned on with leave of court. If the phone is turned on during the hearing it shall be done in non-transmitting mode. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/3/2019. (HEG)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to File a Corrected Reply Brief is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/27/2019. (HEG)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDERED: Defendant's motions, Docs. 83, 85, 86, 87, and 88, are DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with L.R. 7.l(c)(l) and (d)(l )(A). Amended motions and supporting documents may be filed in compliance with the rules of this Court. If any of the motions are refiled, the responding party will have the time allotted under L.R. 7.l(d)(l)(B) in which to respond. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/20/2019. (HEG)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 71 Motion to File Under Seal subject to and upon the conditions of this order. (See order for details). Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/20/2018. (HEG)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDERED: Plaintiff shall file her expert witness disclosure on or before November 1, 2018. Defendant shall file its expert witness disclosure on or before December 14, 2018. The parties' expert witness disclosures shall comply with the Court 's scheduling order of May 16, 2018. All other deadlines remain in full force and effect. Further requests to amend the provisions of the scheduling order of May 16, 2018, as modified herein, are unlikely to be granted. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/23/2018. (HEG)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 1/11/2019. Motions due by 3/8/2019. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 5/3/2019. (See Order for additional deadlines and information.) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/16/2018. (NOS)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by Wendy Tolliver-McGregor. Plaintiff shall file a status report on or before March 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/31/2018. (NOS)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Vacate ; granting 47 Motion to Stay. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED, and that the 1/31/17 Scheduling Order is vacated and the case stayed up and through 1/31/18. Pla shall file a Status Report on or before 1/31/18. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/3/2017. (ELL)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas C. Hardy, Esq. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/20/2017. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/5/2017. (ELL)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDERED: Dft shall either withdraw the application for pro hac vice admission of Thomas C. Hardy, Esq. or file a withdrawal of Meredith A. Shippee, Esq. or Martin J. Bishop, Esq. as PHV cnsl of record on or before 9/1/17. The Court will take up the applications upon receipt of the response ordered. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/25/2017. (ELL)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ORDERED: Counsel shall ensure that all further filings on behalf of Defendant fully satisfy all requirement of Doc 9 and L.R. 83.1(d). Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/24/2017. (ELL)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Meredith Shippee and Martin Bishop. Copy of Order mailed to counsel and KH Msla provided with affidavits. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 12/20/2016. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/5/2016. (DED)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolliver-McGregor v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Montana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Tolliver-McGregor
Represented By: C. J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Montana, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Auerbach
Represented By: Martin J. Bishop
Represented By: Meredith A. Shippee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?