Softich v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Softich
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2017cv00006
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: DEER LODGE
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded $7,529.58 in attorney's fees and costs, payable to Plaintiff's attorneys. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/5/2017. (ELL)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (ELL)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Remand. IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision on Plaintiff's application for disability insurance benefits is REVERSED AND REMANDED to the COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY for further administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/25/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Softich v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Softich
Represented By: Bernard J. Everett
Represented By: Joseph Ben Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?