Nordholm v. Barkell et al
Plaintiff: William J. Nordholm
Defendant: Tim Barkell, Bill Sather, Richard Pasha, Mark Durkin, Brendan Staley, John Doe and Anaconda-Deer Lodge County
Case Number: 2:2017cv00011
Filed: March 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: DEER LODGE
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Motion for partial summary judgment 66 DENIED. Motion for summary judgment 60 GRANTED on all counts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/4/2019. Mailed to Nordholm (TAG) Modified on 4/5/2019: forwarded to USMS (TAG).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/23/2018. (TCL) Modified on 10/24/2018: mailed to Nordholm (TAG).
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension; 22 Motion for Copies; granting 23 Motion to Quash. Defendants' subpoena issued to Montana State Prison is QUASHED. Deadlines in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/19/2018. Mailed to Nordholm with copies as directed; forwarded to counsel for DOC as directed. (TAG)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Pursuant to FRCP 4(d) the Court will request Dfts to waive service of the summons and Nordholm's Amended Complaint by executing, or having cnsl execute, the Waiver of Service of Summons. (See Order for Complete Details and Deadlines) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/21/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordholm v. Barkell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Nordholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Barkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Sather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pasha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anaconda-Deer Lodge County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?