John Doe v. Montana State University et al
Case Number: 2:2017cv00015
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDERED: This case is DISMISSED on the merits, with prejudice, as fully and finally compromised, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/10/2019. (HEG)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDERED: The Joint Motion for Ten Day Extension to File Dismissal (Doc. 175) is GRANTED. The parties may have to and including April 10, 2019, to file a stipulation for dismissal and proposed order of dismissal. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/28/2019. (HEG)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDERED: granting 141 Motion for Leave to conduct via telephonic conference call. The Court will conduct the status conference set for 10:00 a.m. on February 13, 2019, via telephonic conference call. Counsel shall call 1-858-812-0972 followed by 3000038# before the scheduled time to be connected to the conference. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/5/2019. (HEG)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDERED: The stipulation of counsel is accepted and is adopted on the order of the Court. The Court will conduct a status conference with counsel on 2/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Contract Court Reporter is Needed. Upon further stipulation and agreement of the parties, the Court will consider conducting the status conference by telephone conference. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/30/2019. (HEG)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are DENIED. Counts I, II, III and IV survive and will be set for trial. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/21/2018. (HEG)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDERED: 1. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Defendants' Motions in Limine are DENIED without prejudice to resubmission. 2. Plaintiff shall have to and including August 10, 2018, in which to file a Fourth Amended Complaint in replacement of the Third Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have to and including August 24, 2018, in which to file an amended pleading in response to Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint. 3. Defendan ts' amended responsive pleading shall include all defenses to the Fourth Amended Complaint claimed by Defendants and shall be accompanied by motions and briefs in support of defenses asserted by Defendants to be appropriate for submission. 4 . Plaintiff may submit, promptly upon receipt of Defendants' amended responsive pleading, any motion available to Plaintiff, directed to the Fourth Amended Complaint, with accompanying briefs in support. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/25/2018. (HEG)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDERED: Defendants' Unopposed motion to File Exhibit Under Seal is GRANTED subject to the terms, conditions and limitations in paragraph 2 of this Order. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/27/2018. (HEG)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDERED: Defendants' Motion for In Camera Inspection is DENIED as Moot. Production of the three items identified in paragraph 2 above is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice to renewal of any partic ular request on or before March 30, 2018, at 4:45 p.m. upon demonstration of good cause, including satisfaction of the requirements outlined in paragraph 3 above. Brief in Response to Order due by 4/6/2018, at 4:45 p.m. Please review entire order for complete details. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/23/2018. (HEG)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying as moot 51 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/28/2018. (ASG)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice for failure to comply with L.R. 7.1(c)(1). Defendants may resubmit the motion and supporting documents in proper form. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/19/2018. (NOS)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 53 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 47 Unopposed MOTION Sarah E. York to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Sarah E. York is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/8/2018. (NOS)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 49 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiff is directed forthwith to prepare, file, serve upon Defendants and provide proof of service of the Third Amended Complaint. See L.R. 15.1. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/5/2018. (NOS)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Requesting a Protective Order to Protect Witness Identity. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/20/2017. (HEG)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED: Pla and Dft shall ea file a supplemental pp stmt addressing the matters in FRCP 26(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before 8/7/17. FURTHER ORDERED: The PPTC set for 8/7/17 is VACATED and RESET for 8/8/17 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/4/2017. (ELL)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/27/2017. Copy of Order mailed to PHV Counsel. Affidavit provided to S. N. for adding attorney information. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/12/2017. (HEG)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE Jesse R. Binnall, Esq. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/20/2017. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/6/2017. (ELL)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/24/2017. Finance emailed for refunds. (DED)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe v. Montana State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?