Wagner et al v. Summit Air Ambulance et al
Plaintiff: Stan Wagner and Rainy Wagner
Defendant: Summit Air Ambulance, Reach Air Medical Services and Does I-X
Case Number: 2:2017cv00057
Filed: August 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER for DISMISSAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims between Plaintiffs, Stan and Rainy Wagner, and Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/11/2019. (NOS) (Correct order attached. NEF regenerated.) (NOS)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Request to Excuse Third Party Defendant Health Care Service Corporation from Attending Mediation. BCBSMT is excused from attending the mediation scheduled for January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/2/2019. (NOS)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (NOS)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2018. Discovery due by 12/28/2018. Opening Brief due 1/21/19. Response brief due 2/18/19. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/1/2018. (NOS)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 67 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/20/2018. (NOS)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 59 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, Doc. 53 . IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the undersigned will conduct a hearing on Thursday, March 15, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. at the Mike Mansfield Courthouse, Butte, Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/31/2018. (NOS)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Consent to Allow Co-Counsel to Appear for Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Mr. Shlesinger shall appear on behalf of HCSC for the telephonic scheduling conference set for January 31, 2018 and Ms. Betty's presence shall not be required. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/30/2018. (MMS)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amir Shlesinger; granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Martin J. Bishop; granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian Hendricks. Each applicant shall file, within fifteen days, an acknowledgment and acceptance of admission. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/8/2018. (NOS)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 2 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/26/2017. (ELL)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE Charlotte H. Taylor Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/25/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/10/2017. (ELL)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorneys Joshua L. Fuchs, Esq. and Nicole M. Perry, Esq.. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/18/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/3/2017. (ELL)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Vacate. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pptc and hearing on dfts motion to dismiss presently scheduled for 10/4/17 is VACATED. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the pptc and hearing on motion to dismiss will be held on Thursday, 10/12/17 at 1:30 pm before the undersigned. All remaining ddls in the 9/5/17 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/19/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner et al v. Summit Air Ambulance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Wagner
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Represented By: Travis W. Kinzler
Represented By: Margaret C. Weamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainy Wagner
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Represented By: Travis W. Kinzler
Represented By: Margaret C. Weamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Air Ambulance
Represented By: William J. Mattix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reach Air Medical Services
Represented By: William J. Mattix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?