Shchemelinin et al v. Party Princess USA et al
Plaintiff: Anatoly Shchemelinin, Anna Shchemelinin and Big Sky Fairies
Defendant: John Does Defendants 1-10, Creative Costumes, Party Princess USA, XYZ CORPRS 1-10 and Party Princess International
Case Number: 2:2017cv00073
Filed: September 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Big Sky Fairies, Anatoly Shchemelinin, Anna Shchemelinin. (Tierney, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2017 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Party Princess International, Creative Costumes, Party Princess USA AMENDED from Gallatin County District Court, case number CV-17-701C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0977-2020267), filed by Party Princess International, Creative Costumes, Party Princess USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mandelson, Richard) Modified on 10/26/2017 to add text(ELL).
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED: This case will be dismissed on October 26, 2017, unless Defendants file an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Contingent upon Defendants' compliance with this Order, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/19/2017. (HEG)
October 18, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration Jeffrey J. Tierney appearing for Plaintiffs Big Sky Fairies, Anatoly Shchemelinin, Anna Shchemelinin (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Tierney, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2017 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Creative Costumes, Party Princess International, Party Princess USA, filed by Big Sky Fairies, Anatoly Shchemelinin, Anna Shchemelinin. (Originally filed with Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County as Cause No. DV-17-701C on 9/7/17) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ELL)
October 11, 2017 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Creative Costumes, Party Princess International, Party Princess USA, filed by Big Sky Fairies, Anatoly Shchemelinin, Anna Shchemelinin. (Originally filed with the Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County as Cause No. DV-17-701C on 8/15/17) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ELL)
October 11, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Case Register Report with related filings. (ELL)
October 6, 2017 Filing 5 Notice of Correction: re #3 MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration (Brief in Support). The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (ELL)
October 6, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Creative Costumes, Party Princess International, Party Princess USA identifying Corporate Parent Rothchild Enterprises Inc. for Creative Costumes, Party Princess International, Party Princess USA.. (Mandelson, Richard)
October 6, 2017 Filing 3 Brief In Support re #2 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration (Brief in Support) Richard S. Mandelson appearing for Defendants Creative Costumes, Party Princess International, Party Princess USA (Mandelson, Richard) Modified on 10/10/2017 to correct event and term motion (ELL).
October 6, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration Richard S. Mandelson appearing for Defendants Creative Costumes, Party Princess International, Party Princess USA (Mandelson, Richard)
September 29, 2017 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2020267 (ELL)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Party Princess International, Creative Costumes, Party Princess USA from Montana 18th Judicial District Court Gallatin County, case number DV-17-701C., filed by Party Princess International, Creative Costumes, Party Princess USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Part 1, #3 Exhibit A Part 2, #4 Exhibit A Part 3, #5 Exhibit A Part 4, #6 Exhibit A Part 5) (ELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shchemelinin et al v. Party Princess USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Costumes
Represented By: Richard S. Mandelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Party Princess USA
Represented By: Richard S. Mandelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPRS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Party Princess International
Represented By: Richard S. Mandelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anatoly Shchemelinin
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Tierney
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Shchemelinin
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Tierney
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Sky Fairies
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Tierney
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?