Marjamaa v. Lincare, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kasey Marjamaa
Defendant: Lincare, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00013
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Butte Office
County: DEER LODGE
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 23 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order and vacating deadlines. All deadlines and hearings in the Scheduling Order, Doc. 17 , remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/9/2018. (NOS)
June 7, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Status Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2018. Discovery due by 5/31/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 6/29/2018. Motions due by 8/2/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/7/2018. (NOS)
June 4, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ALL PARTIES shall appear by telephone at the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 7, 2018. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/4/2018. (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marjamaa v. Lincare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey Marjamaa
Represented By: Adam C. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincare, Inc.
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?