Naing v. Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation

Plaintiff: Min Naing
Defendant: Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00045
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Remark: Upon Plaintiff's filing of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal on 8/9/18, Doc. #14 , and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is dismissed without further order of the Court. (NOS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Min Naing (Gray, Christopher)
August 1, 2018 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Arbitrate and Stay or, Alternatively, Dismiss Action filed by Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14) (Roth, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Arbitrate and Stay or, Alternatively, Dismiss Action Jeffrey M. Roth appearing for Defendant Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation (Roth, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2018 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch (APP)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (APP)
July 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation (Roth, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Grant Nigolian. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/24/2018. (APP)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION Grant Nigolian to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2167873.) Jeffrey M. Roth appearing for Defendant Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Roth, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed in state court on June 1, 2018 against Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation. (ASG)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of state court file. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (ASG) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/20/2018 to separate complaint) (ASG).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/29/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/29/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/29/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/18/2018. (TXB)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Jeffrey M. Roth, Whitney M. Kolivas, Lindy M. Lauder, Christopher B. Gray. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/3/2018. (APP)
July 13, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2163494 (KJL)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation. (Roth, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court,Gallatin County, case number DV-18-607C, filed by Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Case Register Report) (KJL) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/13/2018) (KJL). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/13/2018) (KJL). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/13/2018) (KJL). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/13/2018) (KJL). (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/13/2018) (KJL). Modified on 7/13/2018 to correct header on documents(KJL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naing v. Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Fresh Concepts Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Roth
Represented By: Lindy M. Lauder
Represented By: Whitney M. Kolivas
Represented By: Grant Nigolian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Min Naing
Represented By: Christopher B. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?