Dick Anderson Construction, Inc. v. Consolidated Divisions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dick Anderson Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Consolidated Divisions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00055
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by John H. Guin (Guin, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dick Anderson Construction, Inc.. Consolidated Divisions, Inc. waiver sent on 9/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Guin, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Consolidated Divisions, Inc.. (Browne, Ryan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dick Anderson Construction, Inc.. (Guin, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Consolidated Divisions, Inc. filed by Dick Anderson Construction, Inc. (NOS)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, Cause No. DV-18-880 A. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 2 - Notice of Removal (pg. 1)) (Original file shelved in Butte clerk's office.) (NOS)
August 23, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2183854. (NOS)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-18-880A, filed by Consolidated Divisions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dick Anderson Construction, Inc. v. Consolidated Divisions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Divisions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian L. Taylor
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dick Anderson Construction, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Guin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?