Hart et al v. Pacificsource Health Plans
Plaintiff: David Cohenour, Coy Cohenour, Hunter Hart, Montana Cohenour and Heidi Hart
Defendant: John Does I-V and Pacificsource Health Plans
Case Number: 2:2018cv00056
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Judge Morris, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/1/2018. (APP)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue Initial Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/7/2018. (TXB)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Continue the preliminary pretrial conference Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff David Cohenour Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/30/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/30/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/30/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/5/2018. (TXB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Does I-V, PacificSource Health Plans, filed by Hunter Hart, Coy Cohenour, David Cohenour, Heidi Hart, Montana Cohenour. (NOS)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, as DV-18-745B. Original file shelved in Butte clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (NOS)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pacificsource Health Plans. (Luck, Bradley)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Daniel Patrick Buckley, Bradley J. Luck, Katelyn J. Hepburn. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/21/2018. (APP)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion to Change Venue. Because this case is in fact venued in the Butte division, Plaintiffs' motion to transfer divisional venue is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/31/2018. (TXB)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue or Confirm Already Situated in Butte Division Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff Coy Cohenour Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacificsource Health Plans. (Luck, Bradley)
August 27, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2185359. (ASG)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pacificsource Health Plans from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-18-745B. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - civil cover sheet, #2 Ex B - State Court Complaint, #3 Ex C - Summons, #4 Ex D - Insurance Commissioner Letter) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart et al v. Pacificsource Health Plans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cohenour
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coy Cohenour
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Hart
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Cohenour
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Hart
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacificsource Health Plans
Represented By: Katelyn J. Hepburn
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?