Fallang v. Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center et al
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Fallang
Defendant: Hull & Swingley, P.C., Michael O'Brien, Sharon O'Brien and Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv00058
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Hull & Swingley, P.C.. (Carlson, Robert)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center, Michael O'Brien, Sharon O'Brien. (Fleming, Patrick)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Richard Lee Fallang. (Vicevich, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Richard Lee Fallang. (Vicevich, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Hull & Swingley, P.C.. (Carlson, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER RESETTING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is RESET for 11/6/2018 at 11:00 AM BY TELEPHONE before Judge Brian Morris. The Court will contact the parties with the call in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/26/2018. (SLL)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement, Joint Discovery Plan, Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/30/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 11:00 AM at the Mike Mansfield Federal Courthouse, Butte, MT, before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/10/2018. (NOS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Hull & Swingley, P.C. (NOS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center, Michael O'Brien, Sharon O'Brien. (NOS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Hull & Swingley, P.C., Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center, Michael O'Brien, Sharon O'Brien, filed by Richard Lee Fallang. (NOS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Montana Second Judicial District Court, Butte-Silver Bow County, Cause No. DV-18-280. Original file shelved in Butte clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 Case file) (NOS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hull & Swingley, P.C.. (Carlson, Robert)
September 4, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2189419. (NOS)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hull & Swingley, P.C. from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-18-280 filed by Hull & Swingley, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fallang v. Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hull & Swingley, P.C.
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Represented By: Robert M. Carlson
Represented By: Clark R. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon O'Brien
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Fallang
Represented By: David L. Vicevich
Represented By: Matthew C. Enrooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?