Wolfe v. Safeway, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jean Ann Wolfe
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Safeway, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00059
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Safeway, Inc.. (Mickelson, Marshal)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Safeway, Inc.. (Mickelson, Marshal)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Jean Ann Wolfe. (Warren, John)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 Statement of Undisputed Fact re: #6 Order Setting, by Jean Ann Wolfe filed by Jean Ann Wolfe. (Warren, John)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/2/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/2/2018. A preliminary pretrial conference to develop a case management plan will be held at l1:00 a.m. on November 14, 2018, at the Chambers of District Judge Sam E. Haddon, Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/9/2018. (HEG)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeway, Inc. (NOS)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Safeway, Inc. and Does 1-10 filed by Jean Ann Wolfe. (NOS)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Montana Fifth Judicial District Court, Beaverhead County, as Cause No. DV-17-14036. Original file held in Butte clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 State Court file) (NOS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice: re #1 Notice of Removal, Filing Fee Received. Name of attorney whose NEF was undeliverable: John S. Warren. (MRC)
September 5, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2189845. (ASG)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeway, Inc. from Montana Fifth Judicial District Court, Beaverhead County, case number 17-14036. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe v. Safeway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Represented By: Clark R. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Ann Wolfe
Represented By: John S. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?