Stover v. Avis Budget Group et al

Plaintiff: Samantha Stover
Defendant: Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC, Does IV-V, Budget Truck Rental, LLC, Avis Budget Group and Budget Rent A Car System, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00060
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dismissal Papers due by 11/28/2018. (TXB)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Vacate Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/6/2018. (TXB)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Preliminary Pretrial Conf & Case Deadlines Murry Warhank appearing for Defendants Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC, Avis Budget Group, Budget Rent A Car System, Inc., Budget Truck Rental, LLC Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Warhank, Murry)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC, Avis Budget Group, Budget Rent A Car System, Inc., Budget Truck Rental, LLC. (Warhank, Murry)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC, Avis Budget Group, Budget Rent A Car System, Inc., Budget Truck Rental, LLC, Does IV-V, filed by Samantha Stover. (NOS)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Avis Budget Group and Does I-Vfiled by Samantha Stover. (NOS)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Montana Third Judicial District Court, Deer Lodge County as Cause No. DV-15-96. Original file held in Butte clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 State Court file) (NOS)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC, Avis Budget Group, Budget Rent A Car System, Inc., Budget Truck Rental, LLC. (Warhank, Murry)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Murry Warhank, Bernard J. Everett. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/1/2018. (APP)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/6/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/6/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/6/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 10:30 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/12/2018. (TCL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC, Avis Budget Group, Budget Rent A Car System, Inc., Budget Truck Rental, LLC. (Warhank, Murry)
September 11, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2192896. (NOS)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District Court, Deer Lodge County, Montana, case number DV-15-96, filed by Avis Budget Group, Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC, Budget Truck Rental, LLC, Budget Rent A Car System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stover v. Avis Budget Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Stover
Represented By: Bernard J. Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC
Represented By: Murry Warhank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does IV-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Truck Rental, LLC
Represented By: Murry Warhank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Budget Group
Represented By: Murry Warhank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Rent A Car System, Inc.
Represented By: Murry Warhank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?