McCullar v. Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center et al

Plaintiff: Michael McCullar
Defendant: Hull & Swingley, P.C., Michael O'Brien, Sharon O'Brien and Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv00067
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center, Michael O'Brien, Sharon O'Brien. (Fleming, Patrick)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Hull & Swingley, P.C.. (Carlson, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Michael McCullar. (Vicevich, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Michael McCullar. (Vicevich, David)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting: Joint Proposed Discovery due by 12/21/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/21/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Conference to develop a case management plan will be held at 11:00 a.m. on January 3, 2019, at the Chambers of District Judge Sam. Haddon, Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/28/2018. (HEG)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hull & Swingley, P.C.. (Carlson, Robert)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Hull & Swingley, P.C.. (Carlson, Robert)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center, Michael O'Brien, Sharon O'Brien. (Fleming, Patrick)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Hull & Swingley, P.C., Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center, Michael O'Brien, Sharon O'Brien filed by Michael McCullar. (NOS)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, as Cause # DV-18-375. Original file held in Butte clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 2 - Summons, #2 3 - Summons, #3 Acknowledgement and Waiver, #4 Notice of Removal) (NOS)
October 24, 2018 Filing fee of $400 received; receipt number 0977-2213889. (NOS)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-18-375, filed by Hull & Swingley, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court file, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullar v. Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hull & Swingley, P.C.
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Represented By: Robert M. Carlson
Represented By: Clark R. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon O'Brien
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick O'Brien Used Car and Truck Center
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCullar
Represented By: David L. Vicevich
Represented By: Matthew C. Enrooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?