Miller v. Action Collection Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emily Miller
Defendant: Action Collection Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00072
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting: A preliminary pretrial conference to develop a case management plan will be held at 11:00 a.m. on February 26, 2019, at the Chambers of District Judge Sam E. Haddon, Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Preliminary Pretrial Statements and Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/4/2019. (HEG)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Action Collection Service, Inc.. (Spencer, Bruce)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emily Miller. Action Collection Service, Inc. waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Eakin, D.)
November 9, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2221402. (ASG)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Action Collection Service, Inc. Mailed to Counsel. (ASG)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Action Collection Service, Inc. filed by Emily Miller. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Action Collection Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Miller
Represented By: D. Michael Eakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Collection Service, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce M. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?