Masterson v. Lanier et al

Plaintiff: Thomas R. Masterson
Defendant: Kyle Lanier and Swan Range Log Homes, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00076
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting: Joint Proposed Discovery due by 2/15/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/15/2019. A preliminary pretrial conference to develop a case management plan will be held at 11:00 a.m. on February 27, 2019, at the Chambers of District Judge Sam E. Haddon, Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/9/2019. (HEG)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kyle Lanier, Swan Range Log Homes, LLC. (McLean, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kyle Lanier answer due 12/31/2018; Swan Range Log Homes, LLC answer due 12/31/2018. (NOS)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Swan Range Log Homes LLC on 12/9/2018, filed by Thomas R. Masterson. (Sherwood, Anne)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kyle Lanier on 12/9/2018, filed by Thomas R. Masterson. (Sherwood, Anne)
December 4, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2232500. (NOS)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kyle Lanier, Swan Range Log Homes, LLC. Originals mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (KJL)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas R. Masterson, filed by Thomas R. Masterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment 2-2-9, #2 Exhibit Civil Action, #3 Exhibit Payment Record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masterson v. Lanier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Masterson
Represented By: Anne E. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Lanier
Represented By: Matthew F. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swan Range Log Homes, LLC
Represented By: Matthew F. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?