Wilson v. State of Montana et al
Plaintiff: Ray Dean Wilson
Defendant: County and City of Butte and State of Montana
Case Number: 2:2018cv00078
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Response due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/4/2019. Mailed to Wilson at Iowa St address with form (TAG)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Mail sent to Wilson at BDC Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Wilson at address listed on docket and to BDC address written on envelope containing #1 (TAG)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Ray Dean Wilson. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. State of Montana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County and City of Butte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Dean Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?