Bodine v. Salesforce.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kim Bodine
Defendant: John Does 1-5 and Salesforce.com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00004
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Kim Bodine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (leFeber, Bridget)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Insurace Declaration Page) (McClafferty, Brianne)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Undisputed Fact re: #2 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order,. (leFeber, Bridget)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Kim Bodine. (leFeber, Bridget)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Complaint by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Judge Morris, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/27/2019. (APP)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Salesforce.com, Inc., and John and Jane Does 1-5 filed by Kim Bodine. (NOS) (Modified to change file date.)(NOS)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, as Cause No. DV-18-1222C. File will be held in Butte clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal) (NOS) (Modified to change file date.) (NOS)
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings:. Initial Conference reset for 3/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TXB)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Vacate Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/29/2019. (TXB)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate and Reset The Preliminary Pretrial Conference Bridget W. leFeber appearing for Plaintiff Kim Bodine Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (leFeber, Bridget)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Salesforce.com, Inc. (Cave, Bradley)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Bridget W. leFeber, Brianne C. McClafferty, Bradley T. Cave. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/11/2019. (APP)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER. The unopposed motion of Defendants requesting an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond (doc.5) is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before February 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/18/2019. (Lynch, Jeremiah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Brianne C. McClafferty appearing for Defendant Salesforce.com, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order Granting Extension) (McClafferty, Brianne)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/18/2019. (TCL)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Bradley T. Cave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2252060.) Brianne C. McClafferty appearing for Defendant Salesforce.com, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brad Cave, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Admission) (McClafferty, Brianne)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/12/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/12/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/12/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/18/2019. (TCL)
January 17, 2019 Filing fee of $ 400. Receipt number 0977-2251508 (KJL)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Salesforce.com, Inc., John Does 1-5 from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, case number DV-18-1222C., filed by Salesforce.com, Inc., John Does 1-5. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Notice of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodine v. Salesforce.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Represented By: Bradley T. Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Bodine
Represented By: Bridget W. leFeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?