Ellison v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Margaret Ellison
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00005
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilson, Jon)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilson, Jon)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting: A preliminary pretrial conference to develop a case management plan will be held at 11:00 a.m. on April 4, 2019, at the Chambers of District Judge Sam E. Haddon, Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/26/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/26/2019. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/22/2019. (HEG)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Margaret Ellison. (NOS)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Receipt of State Court File. Case originally filed in Montana Third Judicial District Court, Deer Lodge County, as cause no. DV 18-141. Original case file held in Butte Division clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Notice of Removal) (NOS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilson, Jon)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilson, Jon)
January 18, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2251895 (APP)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Mont 3rd Jud Dist Crt, Deer Lodge County, case number DV-18-141. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Ex 2 State Court Summons, #3 Ex 3 State Court Service, #4 Ex 4 State Court Notice of Removal) (APP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Brett Charles Jensen
Represented By: Jon A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Ellison
Represented By: Adam C. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?