Post v. Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Post
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00011
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/11/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/17/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2019. Motions due by 12/13/2019. Status Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Butte, MT. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 01:30 PM in Butte, MT. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/5/2019. (NOS)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/5/2019. (Law Clerk: J. Brown), (SLL)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Joseph Post. (Cossi, Domenic)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Joseph Post. (Cossi, Domenic)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Joseph Post. (Cossi, Domenic)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation. (Haywood, Taylor)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation and John Does 1-10 filed by Joseph Post. (NOS)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court as Cause No. DV-19-9B. Original file will be retained in Butte clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 Document 2, #2 Document 3, #3 Document 4) (NOS)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. ALL PARTIES will attend the preliminary pretrial conference set for March 5, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. by TELEPHONE. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/19/2019. (NOS)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference Taylor T. Haywood appearing for Defendant Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Haywood, Taylor)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation. (Haywood, Taylor)
February 11, 2019 Remark: File receipt confirmation from Lake County District Court on 2/11/19. (NOS)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/26/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/26/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/26/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 11:00 AM at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, MT. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/11/2019. (NOS)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation. (NOS)
February 8, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2262207. (NOS)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-19-9B, filed by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post v. Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Taylor T. Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Post
Represented By: Maxwell E. Kirchhoff
Represented By: Domenic A. Cossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?