Allum v. State of Montana et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Allum
Defendant: Does 1-100, Anna Pudelka, State Fund, Thomas E. Martelo, Wilbur Pino, State of Montana, Melissa Quale, Department of Labor and Montana
Case Number: 2:2019cv00012
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Remark: CD delivered in conjunction with Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Response Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss shelved in Missoula clerk's office. (NOS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Department of Labor, Does 1-100, Thomas E. Martelo, Montana, Wilbur Pino, Anna Pudelka, Melissa Quale, State Fund, State of Montana, filed by Robert L. Allum. (NOS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Allum. Department of Labor served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019; Thomas E. Martelo served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Anna Pudelka served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019; Melissa Quale served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019; State Fund served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019; State of Montana served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (NOS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Robert L. Allum as to Wilbur Pino. (NOS) (Modified to correct filing date.) (NOS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: #10 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of Status Conference in WCC 2019-4515). (Original held on shelf in Missoula clerk's office.) (NOS) (Modified to correct filing date.) (NOS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert L. Allum. (Attachments: #1 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION.) (NOS) (Received in Butte clerk's office on 4/8/19.)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Vacate June 11, 2019 pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/22/2019. (TCL) (Modified on 3/22/2019; copy to Plaintiff.) (NOS)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #4 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, filed by Department of Labor, Thomas E. Martelo, Montana, Anna Pudelka, Melissa Quale, State Fund, State of Montana. (O'Connor, Quinlan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #4 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, Quinlan L. O'Connor appearing for Defendants Department of Labor, Thomas E. Martelo, Montana, Anna Pudelka, Melissa Quale, State Fund, State of Montana Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Connor, Quinlan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Department of Labor, Thomas E. Martelo, Montana, Anna Pudelka, Melissa Quale, State Fund, State of Montana. (O'Connor, Quinlan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Quinlan L. O'Connor appearing for Defendants Department of Labor, Thomas E. Martelo, Montana, Anna Pudelka, Melissa Quale, State Fund, State of Montana Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (O'Connor, Quinlan)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/4/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/4/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/25/2019. (TCL) (Modified on 2/25/2019; copy mailed to Allum.) (NOS)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Mailed to Allum. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Service, #2 Pro Se Request to File by Email). Mailed to Allum. (NOS)
February 20, 2019 Remark: $400 filing fee paid via money order in Butte. (Money order sent via FedEx to Missoula for receipting.) (NOS) Modified on 2/21/2019; receipt # MTX9-13367. (NOS)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Originals to Plaintiff at clerk's office in Butte.) (NOS)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert L. Allum. (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allum v. State of Montana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Pudelka
Represented By: Quinlan L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Fund
Represented By: Quinlan L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Martelo
Represented By: Quinlan L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Represented By: Quinlan L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Quale
Represented By: Quinlan L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor
Represented By: Quinlan L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana
Represented By: Quinlan L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Allum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?