Principal Life Insurance Company v. Estate of Jack R. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Principal Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Estate of Clyde R. Smith Jr., Clyde Smith Company, John Does 1-10, Estate of Jack R. Smith, Edward Jones Trust Company, Pamela Mary Starke, James Smith, Smith Brothers Ranch, Marvin Miller and Estate of Gilmer H. Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv00027
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Clyde Smith Company, Edward Jones Trust Company, Estate of Clyde R. Smith Jr., Estate of Gilmer H. Smith, Estate of Jack R. Smith, Marvin Miller, James Smith, Smith Brothers Ranch, Pamela Mary Starke. (Originals mailed to Plaintiff's counsel.) (NOS)
July 23, 2019 Funds Received in Clerk of Court's Office from Browning, Kaleczyc, Berry & Hoven, P.C. Check in the amount of $95,650.96, check no. K-18720617, from Principal Life Insurance Company. (Receipt # MTX9-13945). (NOS)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $93,311.77. Copy of order provided to finance via ad hoc. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/16/2019. (HEG)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S. C. Section 1335) Laura K. Buchholtz appearing for Plaintiff Principal Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Registry Deposit Information Form) (Buchholtz, Laura)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Deposit Funds #4 is DENIED without prejudice to renewal in appropriate form. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/11/2019. (HEG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S. C. Section 1335) Laura K. Buchholtz appearing for Interpleader Principal Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Registry Deposit Information Form) (Buchholtz, Laura)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants, filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Buchholtz, Laura)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED: This case will be dismissed on July 10, 2019, unless Interpleader- Plaintiff files an amended pleading properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Upon the filing of any amended complaint referenced in paragraph I, and prior to the filing of any other motion, Interpleader-Plaintiff shall file with the Court a motion to deposit funds into the registry of the Court, in compliance with 28 U.S.C. l 335(a)(2) and L.R. 67.1. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/8/2019. (HEG)
June 21, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2327774. (ASG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for interpleader and declaratory relief filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principal Life Insurance Company v. Estate of Jack R. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sara S. Berg
Represented By: Laura K. Buchholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Clyde R. Smith Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Smith Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Jack R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Jones Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Mary Starke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Brothers Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Gilmer H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?