Locati Architects, LLC et al v. Nolte
Plaintiff: Locati Architects, LLC and Locati Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Abraham Boone Nolte
Case Number: 2:2019cv00032
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for a More Definite Statement are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/9/2019. (HEG)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Abraham Boone Nolte, filed by Locati Architects, LLC, Locati Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non - Disclosure Agreement and Receipt of Acknowledgment, #2 Exhibit B - File Theft Structure) (Griffin, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Responses due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/28/2019. (HEG)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement Robert C. Griffin appearing for Plaintiffs Locati Architects, LLC, Locati Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Griffin, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Griffin on behalf of Locati Architects, LLC, Locati Enterprises, Inc. (Griffin, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Abraham Boone Nolte. (Geddes, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. James Devlan Geddes appearing for Defendant Abraham Boone Nolte (Geddes, James). (Added additional motion event.) (NOS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 Copyright form transmitted to the U.S. Copyright Office. Original to filer. (AEC)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Abraham Boone Nolte on 7/26/19 , filed by Locati Architects, LLC, Locati Enterprises, Inc. (Frederick, Samuel) (Modified to amend docket text.) (NOS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Abraham Boone Nolte. Original picked up at Butte counter. (ASG)
July 17, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2338069. (ASG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Locati Architects, LLC and Locati Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Non-Disclosure Agreement, #2 Ex B - Defendant File Theft Structure, #3 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locati Architects, LLC et al v. Nolte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Boone Nolte
Represented By: James Devlan Geddes
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locati Architects, LLC
Represented By: Samuel J. Frederick
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locati Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel J. Frederick
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?